U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40027-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Thigpen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 22, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 29, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Response]
  • June 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 01, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 22, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 22, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.