U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown Otter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 12, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Request]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.