U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crow Ghost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 30, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Furlough]
  • September 03, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Request]
  • April 24, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.