U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crow Necklace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order Accepting Plea and Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 24, 2019: [Request]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2019: [Request]
  • April 23, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.