U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fallis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 02, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 06, 2019: [Extend]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 28, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Request]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2019: [Request]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2019: [Request]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.