U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cloke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 03, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 26, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 06, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 06, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Request]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.