U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 20, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order Modifying Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 14, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 03, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Request for Summons]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.