U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dreamer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 09, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver]
  • December 19, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 07, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 11, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 12, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response]
  • July 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extend]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Request]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.