U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • July 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 08, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 27, 2020: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • May 26, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Request]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 25, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.