U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medicine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 05, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2019: [Request]
  • May 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.