U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 03, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 11, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 07, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.