U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. His Law
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Request]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 08, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.