U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kenefick et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 02, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 26, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 16, 2022: [Response]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extend]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 14, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • January 11, 2022: [Admission]
  • January 04, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extend]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 30, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 08, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 29, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extend]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 14, 2020: [Furlough]
  • December 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 12, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 10, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 10, 2020: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 14, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 29, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 29, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Response]
  • March 24, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 04, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 12, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 10, 2020: [Extend]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Joinder]
  • January 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • January 15, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 04, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • December 02, 2019: [Joinder]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Supplement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extend]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 01, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 01, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 05, 2019: [Objection]
  • September 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 23, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Suppress]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.