U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 13, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 09, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.