U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 02, 2020: [Vacate (Not 28:2255)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.