U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury Question]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.