U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 15, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 09, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.