U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Consent]
  • January 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 04, 2019: [Request]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.