U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aviles-Orpineda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 20, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Request]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.