U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 08, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • August 16, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Response]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • June 15, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 07, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 11, 2020: [Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Consent]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Response]
  • May 29, 2019: [Request]
  • May 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 21, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 21, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 13, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.