U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Connors
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 12, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Request]
  • May 09, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 09, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.