U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prairie Chicken
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 20, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 18, 2019: [Proposed Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Response]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 14, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.