U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 10, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 20, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 16, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 22, 2020: [Leave to]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 07, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2020: [Response]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 12, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2019: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 10, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2019: [Request]
  • July 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 10, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.