U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arehart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2021: [Judgment - Amended (Rule 35)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Judgment - Amended (Rule 35)]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Declaration]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 18, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Request]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.