U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sweeten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 25, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 18, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 31, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • August 06, 2019: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.