U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shockey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.