U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poorman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 06, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 30, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 30, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • October 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 28, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 23, 2019: [In Limine]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Request]
  • June 17, 2019: [Request]
  • June 14, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 06, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2019: [Request]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.