U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smashed Ice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 11, 2019: [Extend]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Request]
  • May 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 17, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Request]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.