U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standing Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 19, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • December 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Request]
  • July 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 09, 2019: [Request]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.