U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. His Law
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Joinder]
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Request]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Request]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.