U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fast Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 20, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Request]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 14, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 07, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 07, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 25, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Request]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 29, 2019: [Request]
  • May 29, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 29, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.