U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taken Alive
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 30, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • September 15, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Request]
  • June 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.