U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 06, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 01, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Request]
  • May 29, 2019: [Request]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.