U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bald Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 23, 2020: [Response]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 08, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extend]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • August 21, 2020: [Admission]
  • August 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 19, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 18, 2020: [Release from Custody]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Expedite ]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • June 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Request]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.