U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 01, 2021: [Forfeiture]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 26, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Request]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 30, 2019: [Request]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 30, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 29, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.