U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crane
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 03, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 14, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 11, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2020: [In Limine]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • September 08, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 08, 2020: [For Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 04, 2020: [Brief]
  • September 04, 2020: [In Limine]
  • September 03, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 03, 2020: [Witness List]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 27, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 17, 2020: [Brief]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice]
  • March 10, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 20, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 17, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Request]
  • May 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Request]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.