U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keepseagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 29, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Dismiss Count]
  • May 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 10, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 10, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 10, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 07, 2021: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • January 05, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 17, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Response]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 13, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 13, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Verdict]
  • July 10, 2020: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • July 10, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 10, 2020: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 08, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 08, 2020: [Jury List]
  • July 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 07, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 07, 2020: [Brief]
  • July 07, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 07, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 06, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 06, 2020: [Witness List]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 23, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 22, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • June 22, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 17, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 16, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • May 15, 2020: [Request]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 29, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2020: [Produce ]
  • March 31, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 21, 2019: [Request]
  • May 21, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • May 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2019: [Request]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.