U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dubray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 12, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2019: [Request]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 31, 2019: [Request]
  • May 30, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.