U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanders et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reduce Sentence (Part A & B Criminal History Amendment)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2023: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 03, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 03, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Furlough]
  • January 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Consent]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 08, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 29, 2019: [Objection]
  • May 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.