U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jandreau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • July 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Request]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.