U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bunch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 20, 2020: [Forfeiture]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 23, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Request]
  • May 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 16, 2019: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.