U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 16, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 29, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • July 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (deactivated)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Response]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2019: [Request]
  • June 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.