U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neri-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2019: [Response]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Request]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.