U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeMarrias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response]
  • July 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Request]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 10, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • July 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.