U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.