U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 10, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 10, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 10, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 10, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Request]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 14, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 14, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2019: [Request]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.