U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2020: [Extend]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 08, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Request]
  • October 07, 2019: [Request]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Arrest (deactivated)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Arrest]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.