U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larvie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Submit Supplemental Briefing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 20, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 20, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 02, 2020: [Extend]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 30, 2020: [For Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 22, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 27, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Request]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 01, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 29, 2019: [Request]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.