U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kimmel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 10, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 22, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Request]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Request]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.