U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • July 31, 2020: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • July 23, 2020: [Text Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 23, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 23, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 23, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 23, 2020: [Verdict]
  • July 23, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 22, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 21, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 21, 2020: [Jury List]
  • July 21, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 21, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 21, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice]
  • July 20, 2020: [Objection]
  • July 19, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 17, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 17, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 17, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 15, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response]
  • July 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • July 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2020: [Jury List]
  • July 02, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2020: [Brief]
  • July 02, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 01, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Consent]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Request]
  • August 19, 2019: [Request]
  • August 15, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Request]
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 29, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2019: [Request]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.